Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/05/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/05/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/06/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/06/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/06/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/06/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/18/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/18/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/18/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/18/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/18/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/18/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/18/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/18/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/18/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/18/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/20/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/20/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/27/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/09/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/16/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/22/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/04/1996