Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/09/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/09/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/09/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/09/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/09/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/09/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/09/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 01/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/13/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/13/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/17/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/19/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/20/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/20/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/20/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/23/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/23/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/23/1995
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/24/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/24/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 01/24/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/26/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/26/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/26/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/26/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/31/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/01/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/01/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/01/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/09/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/09/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 02/09/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/09/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/13/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/13/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/21/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/21/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 02/22/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/23/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/07/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/07/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/07/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/07/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/14/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/14/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/15/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/22/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/22/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/23/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/28/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/05/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/05/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/06/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/06/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/03/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/15/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/15/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/16/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/22/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/22/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/23/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/25/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/16/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/26/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/27/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/28/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/30/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/11/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/18/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/19/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/21/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/24/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/24/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/27/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/08/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/12/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/17/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/18/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/24/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/02/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 11/16/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 11/17/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 12/05/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/12/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 12/13/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 12/13/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 12/20/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/21/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/23/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 01/24/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 01/25/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/14/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/06/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/26/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew