Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/10/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/12/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/12/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/18/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/20/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/20/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/24/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/24/1996
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/24/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/24/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/24/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/24/1996