Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/12/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/19/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/19/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/19/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/19/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/19/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/09/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/09/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/09/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/09/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 07/09/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/09/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/09/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/16/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/26/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/26/1996
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/02/1996