Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/12/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/10/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/10/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/30/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/30/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/30/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/30/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/30/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/30/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/30/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/30/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/02/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/04/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/04/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/04/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/04/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/04/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/19/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/19/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/19/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/19/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/1996