Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/19/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/19/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/19/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/19/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/31/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/25/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/27/1996