There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend through December 31, 1998, the period during which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs is authorized to provide priority health care to certain veterans who were exposed to Agent Orange or who served in the Persian Gulf War and to make such authority permanent in the case of certain veterans exposed to ionizing radiation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/16/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/27/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-648.
06/13/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/28/1996HouseSee H.R.3118.
07/17/1996SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
07/16/1996-1:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/16/1996-1:39pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
07/16/1996-1:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
07/16/1996-1:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7546-7552)
07/16/1996-1:21pmHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/27/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 327.
06/27/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-648.
06/20/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/20/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/18/1996HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
06/18/1996HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care
06/18/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/13/1996HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/13/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/13/1996 Referred to
06/20/1996 Markup by
06/27/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-648
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care06/18/1996 Referred to
06/18/1996 Markup by
06/18/1996 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/17/1996 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3643. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/16/1996)

Makes herbicide-exposed veterans eligible for hospital and nursing home care for any disease among those for which the National Academy of Sciences has determined: (1) there is sufficient evidence to conclude a positive association between occurrence of the disease and exposure to a herbicide agent; (2) there is evidence which suggests such an association, though such evidence is limited in nature; or (3) available studies are insufficient to permit a conclusion about the presence or absence of such an association. Makes such veterans eligible for such care for a disease for which the Secretary of Veterans Affairs determines there is credible evidence suggestive of such an association.

Makes radiation-exposed veterans eligible for such care for any disease currently listed among covered diseases or any other disease for which the Secretary determines there is credible evidence of a positive association between occurrence of the disease and exposure to such radiation. Extends through 1998 the authority to provide such care.

Extends: (1) through 1998 the authority to provide outpatient care to herbicide-exposed veterans; and (2) permanently the authority to provide such care to radiation-exposed veterans.

Authorizes priority health care for veterans who may have been exposed to a toxic substance or environmental hazard while serving on active duty in Israel or Turkey during the period between August 2, 1990, and July 31, 1991.

(Sec. 2) Authorizes the Secretary to establish in the Veterans Health Administration (VHA) of the Department of Veterans Affairs a Committee on Care of Severely Chronically Mentally Ill Veterans, which shall continually assess the capability of VHA to meet the treatment and rehabilitation needs of mentally ill veterans (including women) whose mental illnesses are severe and chronic and who are eligible for health care furnished by the Department. Requires various reports with respect to such Committee and its assessments.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary to establish and operate centers for mental illness research, education and clinical activities to represent various U.S. geographic regions. Allows the designation of no more than five centers. Outlines requirements for proposals submitted for designation as a center. Authorizes appropriations for FY 1998 through 2001 for basic support of center activities. Directs the Under Secretary of Health for the VHA to allocate other Department funds for such centers. Requires annual reports. Requires at least one center to be designated by January 1, 1998.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the use of disbursement agreements for the administration of pay, benefits, and records of medical residents and interns serving in Department facilities furnishing hospital care or medical services (currently, only Department hospitals).

(Sec. 5) Authorizes the Secretary to suspend special pay agreements in the case of Department physicians and dentists who enter residency training programs, such suspension to last for the duration of the program.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Veterans Health Care Act of 1992 to extend through 1998 and include additional information in an annual reporting requirement on the provision of health care and services for, and research relating to, women veterans.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Center for Women Veterans of the Department to assess the use by women veterans of health services through the Department, including counseling for sexual trauma and mental health services. Requires related reports.

(Sec. 8) Prohibits a mammogram from being performed at a Department facility not accredited for such purpose by a designated private nonprofit organization. Directs the Secretary to prescribe quality assurance and control standards relating to the performance and interpretation of mammograms and the use of Department mammogram equipment and facilities consistent with related standards under the Public Health Service Act. Requires an annual inspection of such equipment and facilities. Requires the Secretary to prescribe and report on implementation of mammogram standards.

(Sec. 9) Directs the Secretary to conduct a survey of, and report to the Congress on, deficiencies of each Department medical center relating to privacy afforded to women patients which may interfere with appropriate patient treatment. Requires high priority to be given to any plans and steps to correct such deficiencies.

(Sec. 10) Authorizes the Secretary to modify the reversionary restrictions placed on specified real property conveyed to Milwaukee County, Wisconsin, in 1954 in order to allow such County to transfer such property to another party as long as the property is used only for civic and recreational purposes.