Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/18/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/27/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/10/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/10/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/22/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/22/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/22/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/31/1996
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/31/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/31/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/31/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/05/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/05/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 09/05/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/05/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/18/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/18/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/18/1996