Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/22/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/23/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/23/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/24/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/04/1996