Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/13/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/26/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/26/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/26/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/26/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/26/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/26/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/26/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/26/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/26/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/26/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/26/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/26/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/26/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/26/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/26/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/26/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/26/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/26/1996
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/26/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/26/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/27/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/27/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/12/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/12/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/12/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/12/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/22/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/22/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/22/1996
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/31/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/31/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/31/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/31/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/11/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/19/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/19/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/27/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/27/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/28/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/30/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/01/1996