Committees: H.R.3675 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations02/06/1996 Referred to
06/19/1996 Markup by
06/19/1996 Reported original measure H. Rept. 104-631
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation02/06/1996 Referred to
04/19/1996 Hearings by
06/06/1996 Markup by
06/06/1996 Reported by
Senate Appropriations06/28/1996 Referred to
07/18/1996 Markup by
07/19/1996 Reported by S. Rept. 104-325
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation07/16/1996 Markup by
07/16/1996 Reported by