Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/10/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/10/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/10/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/10/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/10/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/10/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/10/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/10/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/10/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/16/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/1996
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 07/16/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/16/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/16/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/22/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/22/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/22/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/22/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/22/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/22/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/23/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/23/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/23/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/24/1996
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/24/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/24/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/25/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/25/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 07/25/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/26/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/26/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/26/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/30/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/30/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/30/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/30/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/30/1996
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/01/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/01/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/01/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/01/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/01/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/02/1996