Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 06/25/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/25/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 06/25/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/25/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/22/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/22/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/22/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/23/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/29/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/29/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/31/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/31/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/31/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/02/1996
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/02/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 08/02/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/02/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 08/02/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/04/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/04/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/04/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/04/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/04/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/04/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 09/04/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/11/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/11/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/11/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/12/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/12/1996
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/12/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/18/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 09/18/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/18/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/18/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/18/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/18/1996
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/19/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/19/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/19/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/24/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/24/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/25/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/25/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/28/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/1996