Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 06/26/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 06/26/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/09/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/09/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/09/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/10/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/10/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/16/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 07/16/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/22/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/23/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/26/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/26/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/04/1996