Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 06/26/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/17/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/17/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/17/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/24/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/24/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 08/01/1996