Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/17/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/17/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/26/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/26/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/07/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/02/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/06/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/06/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/08/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/30/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/11/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/12/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/12/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/12/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/12/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/12/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/12/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/12/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/12/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/12/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/12/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/12/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/12/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/12/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/12/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/12/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/12/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/12/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/12/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/12/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/12/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/18/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/02/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/19/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 11/08/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/08/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 11/08/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/09/1995