Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/27/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/18/1996