Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/12/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/24/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 07/24/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 07/24/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 08/02/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/11/1996