Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/24/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/01/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/02/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/04/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/04/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 09/04/1996