Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 06/27/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/27/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/12/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/16/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/16/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/16/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/16/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/22/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/22/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/22/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/26/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/26/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/01/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/23/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/23/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/25/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/27/1996