Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 07/10/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 07/10/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/10/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/12/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/12/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 07/12/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/12/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/12/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/16/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/16/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/16/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/16/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/16/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/22/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/22/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/22/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 07/26/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/26/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/30/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/17/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/17/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/17/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/26/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/26/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/28/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/28/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/30/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/03/1996