Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/12/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/1996
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 07/12/1996
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/12/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/12/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/12/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/12/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/23/1996
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/23/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/23/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/23/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/23/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/23/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/23/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/23/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/23/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/23/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/23/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 07/23/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/23/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/23/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/24/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/24/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/24/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/24/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/26/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/26/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/26/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/26/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/26/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/26/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/30/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/30/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/30/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/30/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/30/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 08/02/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1996