Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/11/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/11/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/11/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/11/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/12/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/12/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/12/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/23/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/23/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/30/1996