Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/26/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/31/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/31/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 07/31/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/31/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/31/1996
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/02/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/02/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/24/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/24/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/24/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/24/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/27/1996