Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8]* 07/17/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/17/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/17/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/17/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/22/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/26/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/01/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/01/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/04/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/04/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/12/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/19/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/24/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/24/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/24/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/28/1996