Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 07/18/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/18/1996
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 07/18/1996
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/23/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/23/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/23/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/24/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/31/1996
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 08/01/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/01/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 08/02/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/05/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/05/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/12/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/25/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/25/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/27/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/28/1996