Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/25/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/31/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/01/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/01/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 08/02/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/02/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/05/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 09/10/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/10/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/11/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/16/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/16/1996
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/17/1996