Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/31/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 07/31/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/05/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/05/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/05/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/05/1996
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 09/05/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/11/1996
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/11/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/11/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/11/1996
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/11/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/11/1996
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/11/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 09/11/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/11/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/11/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/12/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/12/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/17/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/17/1996