There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Space Commercialization Promotion Act of 1996

Short Titles as Introduced

Space Commercialization Promotion Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage the development of a commercial space industry in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/17/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/1996Committee on Government Reform discharged.
09/17/1996Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 104-801, Part I.
08/01/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
09/18/1996SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/17/1996-5:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/1996-5:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/17/1996-4:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/17/1996-4:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10470-10478)
09/17/1996-4:56pmHouseMr. Walker moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/17/1996HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 438.
09/17/1996HouseCommittee on Government Reform discharged.
09/17/1996HouseHouse Committee on Government Reform Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 17, 1996.
09/17/1996HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 104-801, Part I.
09/11/1996HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/11/1996HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/09/1996HouseSubcommittee on Space and Aeronautics Discharged.
08/19/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
08/13/1996HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Action By: Committee on Science
08/01/1996HouseReferred to House Government Reform
08/01/1996HouseReferred to House Science
08/01/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
08/01/1996HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1437)
08/01/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science08/01/1996 Referred to
09/11/1996 Markup by
09/17/1996 Reported by H. Rept. 104-801
House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics08/13/1996 Referred to
09/09/1996 Discharged from
House Government Reform and Oversight08/01/1996 Referred to
09/17/1996 Discharged from
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology08/19/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3936.


Subjects (99)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3936. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/17/1996)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Promotion of Commercial Space Opportunities

Title II: Remote Sensing

Title III: Federal Acquisition of Space Transportation

Services

Space Commercialization Promotion Act of 1996 - Title I: Promotion of Commercial Space Opportunities - Requires the Administrator of the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to deliver to the Congress a market study that examines the role of commercial ventures which could supply, use, service, or augment the International Space Station.

(Sec. 102) Amends Federal law to include reentry vehicles and launch and reentry operations within the scope of commercial space launch activities. Mandates an annual report.

(Sec. 103) Amends Federal law and the Office of Federal Procurement Policy Act to except from certain post-employment restrictions employees or former employees of NASA seeking employment with an entity that is awarded the Space Flight Operations Contract for the Space Shuttle, with specified exceptions.

(Sec. 104) Amends the National Aeronautics and Space Administration Authorization Act, Fiscal Year 1993 to: (1) discontinue funding of the commercial launch voucher demonstration program through the Office of Commercial Programs within NASA (continues funding such program directly through NASA); and (2) extend the program indefinitely.

(Sec. 105) Encourages the President to promote U.S. Global Positioning System standards.

(Sec. 106) Directs NASA to purchase, to the maximum extent possible, space science data from the private sector.

Title II: Remote Sensing - Makes amendments to the Land Remote Sensing Policy Act of 1992 respecting the commercialization of land remote sensing space systems. Modifies license application and issuance requirements to allow U.S. Government agencies to enter into agreements for utilization of a private land remote sensing space system if such remote sensing space system will be licensed by the Secretary of Commerce before commencing its commercial operation. Prohibits duplication of commercial space science data collection or distribution activities by the Federal Government unless such activities would result in significant cost savings to the Federal Government. Repeals the technology demonstration program.

(Sec. 202) Directs the Administrator to: (1) acquire space-based and airborne Earth remote sensing data provided by the private sector for purposes of meeting Government goals for Mission to Planet Earth; and (2) conduct a study to determine the extent to which baseline scientific requirements of Mission to Planet Earth can be met by the private sector, and how NASA will meet such requirements which cannot be met by the private sector. Requires that: (1) the determination of baseline scientific requirements be carried out by the Goddard Space Flight Center; (2) the Commercial Sensing Program at the Stennis Space Center identify private sector Earth remote sensing data that can meet the scientific requirements of Mission to Planet Earth; and (3) the Administrator to determine the extent to which the baseline requirements of Mission to Planet Earth can be met by the private sector and ensure that the Stennis Space Center plays a major coordinating role.

Title III: Federal Acquisition of Space Transportation Services - Requires the Federal Government to procure space transportation services from the private sector whenever such services are required in the course of its activities, subject to exception.

(Sec. 303) Repeals amendments to the Launch Services Purchase Act of 1990 regarding commercial launch services provisions.

(Sec. 304) Provides for authorized Federal uses of excess intercontinental ballistic missiles.