Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 08/01/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 08/01/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 08/01/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/02/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/02/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/02/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/02/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/02/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 08/02/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/02/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/05/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/01/1996