Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/11/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 01/11/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/11/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 01/11/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/11/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/11/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/13/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/19/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/19/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/24/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/27/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/02/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/02/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/02/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/02/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/23/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/23/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/23/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/28/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/28/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/28/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/28/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/28/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/08/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/21/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/04/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/04/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/04/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/04/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 04/04/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/09/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/27/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/27/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/28/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/30/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/30/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/18/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/18/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/18/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/25/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/25/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/25/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/25/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/01/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/01/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/01/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/01/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/01/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 09/08/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/08/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/08/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/08/1995
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/08/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/27/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/18/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/18/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/24/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/24/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/24/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/26/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/26/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/30/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 12/05/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/05/1995