There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Coverage for Clinical Trials Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To permit individuals to continue coverage under Federal health care programs of services while participating in approved clinical studies and to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to make publicly available information on clinical trials.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/02/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
09/04/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
08/29/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
08/29/1996Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
08/09/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
08/08/1996Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, National Security, Veterans' Affairs, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/1996Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Commerce08/02/1996 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment08/09/1996 Referred to
House Ways and Means08/02/1996 Referred to
House National Security08/02/1996 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/29/1996 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs08/02/1996 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care09/04/1996 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight08/02/1996 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight Subcommittee on Civil Service08/08/1996 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3958.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3958. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/02/1996)

Federal Coverage for Clinical Trials Act of 1996 - Prohibits the Medicare program (title XVIII of the Social Security Act), the Federal Employees Health Benefit Plan, the veterans health care program, and the Civilian Health and Medical Program of the Uniformed Services (CHAMPUS) from denying, limiting, or imposing additional conditions on coverage because of participation in an approved clinical study. Directs the Secretary of Heath and Human Services to make available to the public information about clinical investigations and results obtained from approved clinical studies.