Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/11/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/11/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 09/11/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/12/1996
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/12/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/19/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/19/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/19/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/19/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/19/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/1996
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/27/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/27/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/28/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/28/1996