Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/12/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/19/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/19/1996
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/19/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/19/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/19/1996
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/19/1996
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/19/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/19/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/19/1996
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/19/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/24/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/24/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/24/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/24/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/24/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/28/1996