Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/18/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/18/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 09/18/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/18/1996
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/19/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/19/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/19/1996
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/19/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/19/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/19/1996
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/19/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/19/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/19/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/19/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/19/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/19/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/19/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/28/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 10/01/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/01/1996