Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/25/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/26/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 09/26/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/27/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/27/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/27/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/30/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/30/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/01/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/03/1996
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/04/1996