Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 09/24/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/25/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/25/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/25/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/26/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/26/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 09/26/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/26/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/26/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/26/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/26/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/26/1996
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/26/1996
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/26/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/26/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/26/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/26/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/26/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/26/1996
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/26/1996
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/26/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/26/1996
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/26/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 09/26/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/26/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/26/1996
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/26/1996
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/26/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/26/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/26/1996
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/26/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/26/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/26/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 09/26/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/26/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/26/1996
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/26/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/26/1996
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/26/1996
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/26/1996
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/26/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/26/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 09/26/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/26/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/26/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/26/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 09/26/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/26/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/26/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 09/26/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/26/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/26/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/1996
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/27/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 09/27/1996
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/27/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/27/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/27/1996
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/27/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/27/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/27/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/27/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/27/1996
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/27/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/27/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/27/1996
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/27/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/27/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/27/1996
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/27/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/27/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/27/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/27/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/27/1996
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/27/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/27/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/27/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/27/1996
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/27/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/27/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/27/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/27/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/01/1996
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/03/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew