Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/01/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 02/01/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/21/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/21/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/28/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/28/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/28/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/28/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/28/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 03/06/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/06/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/06/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/06/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/06/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 04/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/02/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/02/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/15/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/15/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/15/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/08/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/08/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/08/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/15/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/15/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/15/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/17/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/17/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/24/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/28/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/28/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/28/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 08/01/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/01/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 09/25/1995