There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Invasive Species Act of 1996

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Invasive Species Act of 1996

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for ballast water management to prevent the introduction and spread of nonindigenous species into the waters of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
10/26/1996Became Public Law No: 104-332. (TXT | PDF)
10/26/1996Signed by President.
10/18/1996Presented to President.
10/03/1996Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1996Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1996Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12398-12401)
09/28/1996Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/1996Committee on Resources discharged.
09/28/1996Committee on Transportation discharged.
09/28/1996Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/26/1996Became Public Law No: 104-332. (TXT | PDF)
10/26/1996Signed by President.
10/18/1996HousePresented to President.
10/04/1996SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/03/1996SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1996SenateSenate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/1996SenateReferred to the Committee on Commerce by unanimous consent.
10/03/1996SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12398-12401)
10/03/1996SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works by unanimous consent.
09/30/1996SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/28/1996-11:01pmHouseThe Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 4283.
09/28/1996-11:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/1996-11:01pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/28/1996-10:59pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12146-12152)
09/28/1996-10:59pmHouseMr. Boehlert asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/1996HouseCommittee on Resources discharged.
09/28/1996HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
09/28/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/1996HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/1996HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/28/1996 Referred to
09/28/1996 Discharged from
House Resources09/28/1996 Referred to
09/28/1996 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works10/03/1996 Referred to
10/03/1996 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/03/1996 Referred to
10/03/1996 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (110)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/28/1996)

National Invasive Species Act of 1996 - Amends the Nonindigenous Aquatic Nuisance Prevention and Control Act of 1990 to mandate regulations to prevent the introduction and spread of aquatic nuisance species into the Great Lakes through ballast water. Authorizes education, technical assistance, and other measures to promote compliance. Mandates voluntary guidelines to prevent such introduction and spread in U.S. waters by ballast water and other vessel operations. Mandates education, technical assistance, and other measures to encourage compliance. Requires mandatory regulations if guideline compliance is inadequate. Provides for enforcement through civil and criminal penalties and revocation of clearance. Encourages negotiations with foreign governments to develop and implement an international program for preventing such introduction and spread. Allows a vessel to not conduct a ballast water exchange if the exchange would threaten the safety or stability of the vessel. Allows a vessel that does not, for that reason, conduct an exchange to discharge ballast in any harbor, except in the Great Lakes. Mandates a study and report to the Congress on the effectiveness of existing shoreside ballast water facilities used by crude oil tankers in the coastwise trade off Alaska in preventing such introduction and spread.

Mandates studies of Lake Champlain, the Chesapeake Bay, San Francisco Bay, Honolulu Harbor, the Columbia River system, other estuaries of national significance, and other waters. Provides for making specified amounts available for research on aquatic nuisance species prevention and control in the Chesapeake Bay, the Gulf of Mexico, the Pacific coast, the Atlantic Coast, and the San Francisco Bay-Delta Estuary.

Establishes a clearinghouse of national data on ballasting practices and compliance with guidelines under this Act.

Mandates a ballast water management program for vessels of the Department of Defense and the Coast Guard.

Requires: (1) a ballast water management program to demonstrate technologies and practices to prevent aquatic nonindigenous species from being introduced into and spread through ballast water in U.S. waters; and (2) that the installation and construction of those technologies and practices be performed in the United States.

Modifies: (1) the composition and research priorities of the Aquatic Nuisance Species Task Force; and (2) zebra mussel demonstration program requirements.

Mandates research grants regarding environmentally sound methods for controlling the dispersal of aquatic nuisance species. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires research on environmentally sound methods for preventing and reducing dispersal between the Great Lakes-Saint Lawrence drainage and the Mississippi River drainage through the Chicago River Ship and Sanitary Canal. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires the Task Force to encourage the development and use of regional coordination panels and similar entities in regions in addition to the Great Lakes and Western regions.

Provides for interstate (in addition to existing State) aquatic nuisance species management plans, allowing Indian tribes as well as States to participate.

Authorizes appropriations, including for research on the prevention, monitoring, and control of aquatic nuisance species in Narragansett Bay, Rhode Island.