Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/17/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/17/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/17/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/24/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 01/31/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/31/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/08/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/08/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/27/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/27/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/27/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/27/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/27/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/30/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/30/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/30/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/30/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/30/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/11/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/11/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/11/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 07/11/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/11/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/12/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/12/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/12/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 07/13/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/20/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/20/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/28/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/28/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/01/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 08/01/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 08/01/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/01/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 08/01/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/07/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/07/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/12/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/19/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/21/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/27/1995