Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 01/24/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/24/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/24/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/24/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/24/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/24/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/24/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 01/24/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 01/24/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/24/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/07/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/07/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/07/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/07/1995
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/07/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/07/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/07/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/07/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/24/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/24/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/24/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/24/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/24/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/24/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/24/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/24/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/24/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/24/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/24/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/24/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 02/24/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/24/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/24/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/24/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/21/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/21/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/21/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/21/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/21/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/18/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/18/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/16/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/16/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/24/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/24/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/24/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/31/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/31/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/31/1996
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/31/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 03/05/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/05/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/05/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/22/1996
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/09/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/30/1996