Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/09/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/11/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/11/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/11/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/11/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/11/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/17/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/17/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/18/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/18/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/18/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/18/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/18/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/18/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/18/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/20/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/20/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/20/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/20/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/20/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/20/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/20/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/20/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/23/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/26/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/26/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/26/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 01/26/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/26/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/26/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/30/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/31/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/31/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/31/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/31/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/31/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/02/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 02/02/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/02/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/02/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/06/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/07/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/07/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/07/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/07/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/07/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 02/07/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/07/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/08/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/08/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/09/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/09/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/09/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/09/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/09/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/09/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/09/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/09/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/13/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/13/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 02/23/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/23/1995