Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/19/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/19/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/19/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/19/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/19/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/30/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/30/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/30/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/30/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 01/30/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/30/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/30/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/30/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/10/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/10/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/10/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/10/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/10/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/24/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/24/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/24/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/24/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/24/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/24/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/24/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/14/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/14/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/14/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/03/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/03/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/03/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/03/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 04/03/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/03/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/01/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/15/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/15/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/15/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/15/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/24/1995