Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/13/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/13/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/13/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/17/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/19/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/19/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/24/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/25/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/25/1995