Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/01/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/08/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/08/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/16/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/16/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/16/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/16/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/09/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/22/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/22/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/13/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/13/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/13/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/19/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/19/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/26/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/1995