Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/02/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/16/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/16/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/16/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/16/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 03/16/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/16/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/16/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/16/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/16/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/13/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew