Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/24/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/24/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/24/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/24/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/01/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/07/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/18/1995