Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/11/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/23/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/23/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/1995
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 01/23/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/23/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/23/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/23/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/23/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/23/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/23/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/23/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/31/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/31/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/31/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/31/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/31/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/31/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/31/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/31/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/10/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/10/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/10/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/10/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/10/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/10/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/10/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/10/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/10/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/10/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/10/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/10/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/10/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/21/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/21/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/24/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/24/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/24/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/03/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/03/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/03/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/10/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/21/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 04/05/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/05/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/05/1995