Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/17/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/17/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/17/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/17/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/24/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/24/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/24/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/02/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/02/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/02/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/16/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/16/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/01/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/21/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/23/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/07/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/13/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/13/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/22/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/22/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/26/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 07/26/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/26/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/26/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 08/03/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/03/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/03/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/27/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 10/12/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/28/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/13/1996
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/16/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 04/16/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 04/16/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 04/16/1996
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/16/1996
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/16/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/08/1996
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/27/1996
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/27/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/27/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/27/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/23/1996
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/23/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew