Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/31/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/31/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/27/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/10/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/22/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 03/22/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/05/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/02/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/22/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/22/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/22/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 05/22/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/22/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/22/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/22/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/22/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/07/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/07/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/16/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/02/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 08/02/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/02/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/02/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/02/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/02/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 08/02/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/06/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 09/27/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/27/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/27/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/27/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/27/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/27/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/27/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 09/27/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/28/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/28/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/28/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/28/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 10/12/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/12/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/12/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/12/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/12/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/12/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/12/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/12/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/12/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/26/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/26/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/26/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 10/26/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/26/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 10/26/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/26/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/26/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/30/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/30/1995
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 10/30/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/30/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/30/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/07/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/07/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/07/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 11/07/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 11/07/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/08/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/16/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/16/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 11/16/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/16/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/20/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/20/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/20/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 11/29/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/29/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 11/29/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/29/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/29/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/29/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 11/29/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/30/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 12/07/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 12/07/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 12/07/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 12/07/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 12/07/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/13/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 12/21/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/03/1996
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/05/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/23/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/06/1996
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/06/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/06/1996
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/09/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/13/1996
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/27/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew